skip to content

Berger, Sam

CPSO#: 21505

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 745-4600
Fax: (416) 745-4602 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sam Berger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Berger ( CPSO# 21505 )

Business Address:
303 - 2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 745-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAM BERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1968