skip to content

Bergen, Harry John

CPSO#: 24569

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58755
Fax: (905) 494-6206 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410 Ext. 2217
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harry J. Bergen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARRY JOHN BERGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1986