skip to content

Beres, Alana

CPSO#: 91892

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins and District Hospital, 700 Ross Avenue East, P4N 8P2
Date Received: 11 Aug 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Surgery Effective:24 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
EL - Pediatric General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
EL - Pediatric General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016