skip to content

Bercovici, Eduard

CPSO#: 88773

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southern Ontario Epilepsy Clinic
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 208
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 620-7632
Fax: (416) 620-7633 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
5WW - Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416)6036452
Fax: 416 603 5768
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eduard Bercovici Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bercovici ( CPSO# 88773 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 5-WW
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Sherway Medical Clinic
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 208
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDUARD BERCOVICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERCOVICI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 06 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 06 Jul 2011 to 05 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 06 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013