skip to content

Bercier, Jean-Philippe

CPSO#: 93189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
361 Main St. East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: (613) 632-7073 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jean-Philippe Bercier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bercier ( CPSO# 93189 )

Business Address:
101 - 361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone Number: (613) 632-0605

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8

Business Address:
215 - 3883 Boul Saint-Jean
Dollard-Des Ormeaux QC  H6B 2B9
Phone Number: (514) 624-7363


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-PHILIPPE BERCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERCIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012