skip to content

Bentley-Taylor, Michael Martin

CPSO#: 23790

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 Mohawk Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 2T3
Phone: (226) 989-6771
Fax: 5192087449 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Sunnyside Drive
St George
St George Brant ON  N0E 1N0
Canada
Phone: (519) 448-3331
Fax: (519) 448-3334
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bentley-Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bentley-Taylor ( CPSO# 23790 )

Business Address:
206 Mohawk Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 2T3
Phone Number: (519) 989-6771

Business Address:
St George Medical Center
2 Sunnyside Drive
St George ON  N0E 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 448-3331

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MARTIN BENTLEY-TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENTLEY-TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1971