skip to content

Bentham, William Harry

CPSO#: 16669

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Aug-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.