skip to content

Benson, Gary Lloyd

CPSO#: 23543

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Benson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Associates 155 Main St E Grimsby ON L3M 1P2
Date Received: 03 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2019