skip to content

Benoit, Brien Georges

CPSO#: 18752

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1963
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
129 Helena Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3N3
Phone: (613) 729-6587
Fax: (613) 729-6587 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

875 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Canada
Phone: (613) 725-2000 Ext. 692
Fax: 613-725-1300
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brien Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIEN GEORGES BENOIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENOIT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1965