skip to content

Bennett, Erin Anne

CPSO#: 92741

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Ottawa, ON
K4M 1B2
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: 6136922571
Fax: 6136920271 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yegappan Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yegappan ( CPSO# 89864 )
Dr. E. Bennett ( CPSO# 92741 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN ANNE BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022