skip to content

Benjamin, Sophiya

CPSO#: 100014

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Mar 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Christian Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 479-4300 Ext. 7998
Fax: (519) 894-8308 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital, KW site
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 479-4300 Ext. 7998
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

250 Laurelwood Dr
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D & S Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Benjamin ( CPSO# 100015)
Dr. S. Benjamin ( CPSO# 100014)

Business Address:
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 569-9141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 24 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 18 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017 Active
             Dr.  Sophiya  Benjamin  may  practise  medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Geriatric Psychiatry.