skip to content

Benjamin, Dinesh

CPSO#: 100015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Mar 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Christian Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7025
Fax: (519) 894-8308 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard 911 Queen's
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D & S Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Benjamin ( CPSO# 100014)
Dr. D. Benjamin ( CPSO# 100015)

Business Address:
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 569-9141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active
             Dr. Dinesh Benjamin may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.