skip to content

Benhameid, Osama Saleh

CPSO#: 96785

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Garyounis University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Oct 2011 to 04 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014