skip to content

Ben-Yakov, Maxim B

CPSO#: 93237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Russian

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
R. Fraser Elliott Building, Ground
Room 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: 416-340-4300 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3M 3G8
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
Emergency Division
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3M 3G8
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maxim Ben-Yakov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ben-Yakov ( CPSO# 93237 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
R. Fraser Elliot Buliding, Ground
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Division
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 3G8
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7424

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAXIM B BEN-YAKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN-YAKOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015