skip to content

Ben Nachum, Ilanit

CPSO#: 92030

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ilanit Ben Nachum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ben Nachum ( CPSO# 92030 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:27 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2021 Active
 Dr. ILANIT BEN NACHUM may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.