skip to content

Belovic, Branislav

CPSO#: 25480

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Mar 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Belovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 12 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: MCI The Doctors Office 15 - 2575 Dundas Street West Mississauga, ON L5K 2M6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:26 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020