skip to content

Belostotsky, Vladimir

CPSO#: 96600

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Paediatric Nephrology Unit, Ward 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75635
Fax: (905) 308-7548 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Belostotsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Belostotsky ( CPSO# 96600 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Paediatric Nephrology Unit
Ward 3A55
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:19 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nephrology Effective:19 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Vladimir Belostotsky may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division of Nephrology, McMaster University, in which
                        Dr. Belostotsky  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The   certificate   of   registration   automatically  expires  when  Dr.
                  Belostotsky no longer holds the apointment, referred to in clause 1.