skip to content

Bellissimo, Agostino Mario

CPSO#: 33183

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 May 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6004
Fax: (416) 530-6107 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bellissimo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bellissimo ( CPSO# 33183 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Suite ED
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 388-7616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AGOSTINO MARIO BELLISSIMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLISSIMO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1982