skip to content

Belley-Cote, Emilie-Prudence

CPSO#: 97709

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 527 4322 Ext. 40306
Fax: 905 577 8017 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emilie Belley-Cote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Belley-Cote ( CPSO# 97709 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILIE-PRUDENCE BELLEY-COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLEY-COTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 9 - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012