skip to content

Bellack, Neil Robert

CPSO#: 97935

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613 721 2000 Ext. 2600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neil Bellack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bellack ( CPSO# 97935 )

Business Address:
Arnprior Regional Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
350 John Street
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEIL ROBERT BELLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015