skip to content

Bell, Robert Stuart

CPSO#: 28391

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
03 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents should contact: Health Record Services Princess Margaret Hospital 610 Univeristy Ave Floor 3b Rm 202 Toronto ON M5G 2M9 or Tel: 416-946-4501 ext 4711
Date Received: 18 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 May 2021