skip to content

Bell, Georgina Lorraine

CPSO#: 85831

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 500 Hogarth Avenue Geraldton ON P0T 1M0
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018