skip to content

Bell, Dayna Lindsay

CPSO#: 87873

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAYNA LINDSAY BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
EL - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2013 to 10 Feb 2013
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012