Belkhair, Sirajeddin Suleiman (CPSO#: 101236)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2014 to 01 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015