skip to content

Belisle, Sheena Rose-Meline

CPSO#: 95462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:06 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:12 Feb 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEENA ROSE-MELINE BELISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELISLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 20 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 07 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 24 Oct 2017 to 12 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 13 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018