skip to content

Belay, Kalkidan Taddes

CPSO#: 86941

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 494-6620 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2250 Bovaird Drive East Suite 401
Brampton ON  L6R 2T3
Canada
Phone: (289) 201-3344
Fax: (289) 201-3355
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. T. Belay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Belay ( CPSO# 86941 )

Business Address:
401-2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6595

Business Address:
401-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (289) 201-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KALKIDAN TADDES BELAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012