skip to content

Belanger, Sara

CPSO#: 95550

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 743-6222 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Belanger ( CPSO# 95550 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 741-0651

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA BELANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013