skip to content

Belanger, Joseph Melvine Eric Garry

CPSO#: 23451

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2011