skip to content

Bekasiak, Ann Mary

CPSO#: 96911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0C2
Phone: 519 979 5269
Fax: 519 970 8085 Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6. (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANN MARY BEKASIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEKASIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015