skip to content

Bejuk, Marta Kamila

CPSO#: 89320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Rd #360
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-8789
Fax: (905) 582-5005 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton General Hospital
7030 Derry Rd
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marta Bejuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTA KAMILA BEJUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEJUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014