skip to content

Beheshti, Behnam

CPSO#: 84775

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011