skip to content

Navabi, Behdad

CPSO#: 103448

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Pediatric Consulting Clinic
Suit 305
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Fax: (613) 779-8686 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Behdad Navabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Navabi ( CPSO# 103448)

Business Address:
274 Dundas St E
Suite 305
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: 613-779-7575

Business Address:
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: 613-737-7600

Business Address:
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: 613-938-4240

Business Address:
51 Parkway (the)
Kanata ON  K2K 1T1
Phone Number: 613-319-7996

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: 613-721-2000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Quinte Healthcare Corporation Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEHDAD NAVABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAVABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 25 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2019 to 15 May 2020
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2020