skip to content

Bega, Sivan

CPSO#: 90779

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Durbin, Sivan (used until: 06 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9131 Keele Street
Suite A4
Vaughan ON  L4K 0G7
Phone: 6475577570 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Bega Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bega ( CPSO# 90779 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone Number: (416) 645-9097

Business Address:
9131 Keele St
Suite A4
Concord ON  L4K 0G7
Phone Number: 6475577570


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIVAN BEGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2014