skip to content

Beecroft, David John

CPSO#: 23618

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. John Beecroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Beecroft closed his private practice in 2014. Medical records and care of active patients were transferred to Dr. Scheeres at that time. Patients looking to obtain a copy of their file may contact Dr. Scheeres at: 705-739-7611. Patients who did not continue their care with Dr. Scheeres may send a written medical record request to Dr. Beecroft at: 13 Sutton Heights, Midhurst , ON, L9X 1S2
Date Received: 22 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2019