skip to content

Beder-Goldfarb, Aarin Johanna

CPSO#: 92762

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Center
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aarin Beder-Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beder-Goldfarb ( CPSO# 92762 )

Business Address:
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: 4166212220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARIN JOHANNA BEDER-GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDER-GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012