skip to content

Bedard, Pierre

CPSO#: 23488

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Apr 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pierre Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Heart Institute 40 Ruskin Street Ottawa, ON K1Y 4W7 Some patient records may also be located at: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Rd Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6 The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus 1053 Carling Ave Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 2019