skip to content

Beckwith, Shalea Joanne

CPSO#: 89132

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Piteau, Shalea Joanne (used until: 20 Apr 2020 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1440 Bathurst St
Kidcrew Pediatric Medical Clinic
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone: 4166545437 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Beckwith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beckwith ( CPSO# 89132 )

Business Address:
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
Address: 
111 St Regis Crescent S
North York, ON 
M3J 1Y6
Phone:  (416) 398-0638
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 02 Aug 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHALEA JOANNE BECKWITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKWITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013