skip to content

Beckford, Claudine Gerrilyn

CPSO#: 95705

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: James, Claudine Gerrilyn (used until: 13 Sep 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 718
Suite 300-29 Main St. West
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone: 905-729-4888
Fax: 855-386-2608 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5988 8th Line, Beeton, ON
Beeton ON  L0G1A0
Canada
Phone: (905) 729-2267
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Beckford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Beckford ( CPSO# 95705 )

Business Address:
5988 8th Line
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 729-2267

Business Address:
Beeton Medical Clinic
300-29 Main Street
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 729-4888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAUDINE GERRILYN BECKFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 09 Apr 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015