skip to content

Becker, Henry M

CPSO#: 90923

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
222 Lansdowne Ave
Toronto ON  M6K 3C6 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northhumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: 9053726811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Becker ( CPSO# 90923 )

Business Address:
Northhumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ontario

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HENRY M BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2018