skip to content

Becker, Edna Jean

CPSO#: 21666

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edna Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All requests for medical records should be directed to the hospitals at which the patient was treated.
Date Received: 03 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014