skip to content

Beck, William John

CPSO#: 31535

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Extendicare
309 Queen Mary Rd.
Kingston ON  K7M 6P4
Phone: (613) 549-5010
Fax: (613) 549-7347 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Beck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Beck ( CPSO# 31535 )

Business Address:
309 Queen Mary Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P4
Phone Number: (613) 549-5010

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: 6134531687

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN BECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1980