skip to content

Becerra Zegarra, Alicia

CPSO#: 99028

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Nacional de San Agustin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013