skip to content

Beca, Sorin Gheorghe

CPSO#: 91675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
My Endo Diabetes and Endocrinology
Ashgrove Medical Building
6633 Highway 7 East
unit 105
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (416) 840-7744
Fax: (416) 491-5922 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

My Endo Diabetes and Endocrinology
Lebovic community center
9600 Bathurst St
unit 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 840-7744
Fax: (416) 491-5922
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sorin Beca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 20 2013
Corporation Name: Sorin G. Beca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beca ( CPSO# 91675 )

Business Address:
My Endo Diabetes and Endocrinology
9600 Bathurst Street
Unit 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (416) 480-7744

Business Address:
Cardiomatters Diagnostic Imaging
Unit 105
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (416) 840-7744


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:13 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active
             Dr.  Sorin  Gheorghe  Beca may practise medicine independently in endocrinology
            and metabolism in an out-patient setting, only.