skip to content

Beaudoin, Vanessa Jane

CPSO#: 98538

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
University of Windsor
CAW Student Centre, Room 242
401 Sunset Avenue
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Phone: (519) 253-3000 Ext. 3262
Fax: (519) 971-3637 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wyandotte @ Lauzon Walk-in Clinic
7885 Wyandotte East
Windsor ON  N8S 3M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 251-0761
Fax: (519) 251-8290
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

VCare Clinics
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9X 3V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-7979
Fax: (519) 254-0488
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANESSA JANE BEAUDOIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDOIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2015