skip to content

Beaudoin, Emily Patricia Irene

CPSO#: 92989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2020
EXPIRY DATE
03 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridlewood Medical Centre
64 Stonehaven Dr
Kanata ON  K2M 2Y2
Phone: (613) 592-0805 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jun 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 15 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 19 Nov 2018 to 13 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 03 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Emily  Patricia  Irene  Beaudoin  may  practise family medicine with
                  Bridlewood  Medial  Centre in Kanata, Ontario,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Beaudoin's eligibility to  take  the
                  College of Family Physicians  of  Canada  examination  expires, whichever
                  comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Beaudoin's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Beaudoin's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 4, 2020, and will  expire on or before
                  June 3, 2023, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.