skip to content

Beatty, Myles Franklin

CPSO#: 31270

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
05 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Beatty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2012
Corporation Name: Myles Beatty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Beatty ( CPSO# 31270 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Area F
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-3916

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 1, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Myles Franklin Beatty to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 1, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into a public complaint received by the College that raised concerns about Dr. Beatty’s past obstetrics and gynecology practice. Subsequently, Dr. Beatty resigned from the College. Dr. Beatty has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)