skip to content

Beattie, Walter Herbert

CPSO#: 13845

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 23-Apr-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1987