skip to content

Beattie, Robert Alan

CPSO#: 28645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert A. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 9631 Hwy 62 N RR4 Stirling ON K0K 3E0
Date Received: 06 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 2018