skip to content

Beattie, Lillian May

CPSO#: 15161

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 5-Mar-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1959 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1997