skip to content

Beattie, Erin Dawn

CPSO#: 90571

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone: (613) 533 9303
Fax: (613) 544 9899 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

275 Sydenham St
Kingston ON  K7K 1G7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-4164
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert A. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019
Corporation Name: Erin Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Beattie ( CPSO# 90571 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9

Business Address:
275 Sydenham Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-4164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN DAWN BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011